MD SB326 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 to repeal the requirement that the Board of Directors of the Anne Arundel County Historical Society, Inc. provide a matching fund for specified purposes at the Benson-Hammond House and related outbuildings, located in Linthicum; requiring the Board of Public Works to expend or encumber a specified grant by June 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Anne Arundel County -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (133-3) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-02 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2012-03-20 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-06 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/1 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |