MD SB325 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount which a person is required to pay the tax collector to redeem property sold at tax sale by limiting taxes, interest, and penalties accruing after the sale to include only delinquent taxes, interest, and penalties; and requiring that certain notices include certain information regarding the taxes included in a redemption payment.
Title
Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Fines
Interest
Notices
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Interest
Notices
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 828 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |