MD SB324 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a licensing requirement for specified mechanical musical devices in Carroll County.
Title
Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
Equipment
Licenses
Public Local Laws
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
Equipment
Licenses
Public Local Laws