MD SB322 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a Class 4 limited winery license to prepare, sell, or serve any food under certain conditions; altering certain requirements for off-premises and on-premises consumption at a limited winery; and removing the 14-day notice requirement for certain planned promotional events at a limited winery.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery License - Food Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Report {583723/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {583723/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Qi and Wivell) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2023-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Qi and Wivell) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2023-04-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Beidle, Hayes and Mautz) |
2023-04-10 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2023-04-10 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Beidle, Hayes and Mautz) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463920/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {593722/1 Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB246 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Qi and Wivell)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |