MD SB322 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain per diem licenses in Washington County; altering the requirements for a Class C per diem beer, wine, and liquor license so that the license may be issued to a certain corporation, society, organization, association, or other entity that does not have a certain annual on-sale license; altering the privileges of the license to authorize the holder to sell or serve beer, wine, or liquor for on-premises consumption during an event that requires an admission fee, a ticket, or a donation; etc.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Corporations
Fees
Gifts
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Corporations
Fees
Gifts
Washington County