MD SB322 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to award a reward to a person providing information leading to a conviction for a violation of specified nuisance organism laws or regulations; requiring a specified reward to be paid from specified fine proceeds in an amount not to exceed a specified percentage of fines imposed; and prohibiting a reward from being awarded to a law enforcement officer or an employee of the Department.
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {764534/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Gifts
Hunting and Fishing
Judges
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Witnesses
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Gifts
Hunting and Fishing
Judges
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Witnesses