MD SB322 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, with specified exceptions, a person may not drive a motor vehicle on a State highway if it is equipped with television- type receiving equipment or video display equipment that is turned on and displaying an image visible to a driver while driving; permitting video display equipment in a public service company vehicle or safety or law enforcement vehicle; and permitting specified video display equipment used as a vehicle navigation system or related to operation or safety of a motor vehicle.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Video and Electronic Display Equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (27-2) | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (44-3) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-19 | Special Order 3/22 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-18 | Special Order 3/19 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-18 | Special Order 3/19 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Special Order 3/18 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |