MD SB320 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System may pay certain incentive compensation to the Chief Investment Officer for the State Retirement and Pension System if the Chief Investment Officer retires from the Investment Division of the State Retirement Agency in a certain manner; and correcting a certain incorrect reference of an age restriction applying to certain members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System that participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP).
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarification and Technical Correction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {333627/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB415 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Age
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2023 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |