MD SB320 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB891
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a foreign corporation to certify that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is the corporation's resident agent when registering or qualifying with the Department; and authorizing the Department to act as a resident agent for a foreign corporation that does business in the State without a resident agent or with a resident agent who cannot be found or served with the exercise of reasonable diligence.
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-26) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB891 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Foreign Ownership
Residency
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Foreign Ownership
Residency
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 7 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 7 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 7 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |