MD SB320 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using, selling, manufacturing, or distributing for use or sale commercial dishwashing detergents that contain greater than 0.5 percent of phosphorus by weight after July 1, 2013; and repealing obsolete language.
Title
Environment - Phosphorus - Commercial Dishwashing Detergent
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-4) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |