MD SB32 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Court Administrator to assess a surcharge on specified fees, charges, and costs in specified cases in the Court of Appeals, Court of Special Appeals, and circuit courts; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court to assess a surcharge in specified civil cases; and requiring the surcharges to be deposited in the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Circuit Courts
Court Costs
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Fees
Judges
Real Property
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Circuit Courts
Court Costs
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Fees
Judges
Real Property
Records
Revenue and Taxes