MD SB32 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing brewery licensees to sell beer for on-site consumption under specified circumstances; requiring a specified local licensing board to grant an on-site consumption permit to an applicant that holds specified licenses; providing that an on-site consumption permit entitles the holder to sell beer brewed at the brewery for on-premises consumption to persons that have attained the legal drinking age; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-04-02 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2013-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904035/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-11-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Substance Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Substance Abuse