MD SB318 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a spouse or financially dependent child of an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces who uses GI benefits of the veteran from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State, subject to documentation that the veteran was discharged honorably at any time; repealing a requirement that certain public institutions of higher education comply with federal law relating to nonresident tuition for veterans and veterans' dependents; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB597 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs