MD SB317 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, and Patterson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, and Patterson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include $500,000 in fiscal year 2020 and $750,000 in each of fiscal years 2021 through 2024 in the State budget to the Higher Education Commission for near completer grants for certain recipients; requiring that grants are to be provided on a first-come, first-served basis and may be used only for tuition; establishing the Maryland Community College Promise Program to provide an opportunity for community college students to earn an associate degree or a certificate debt-free; etc.
Title
Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-44) (Y: 92 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Adopted (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Adopted (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, and Patterson |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-09 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senators Pinsky, Kagan, and Waugh |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (91-44) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {375063/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2018-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-13) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Report Adopted (33-13) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Colleges
Corporations
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Loans
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Taxes - Income
Tuition
Budgets
Community Colleges
Corporations
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Loans
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Taxes - Income
Tuition