MD SB317 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs; providing for the terms of office of the appointed members of the Coordinating Council; terminating on December 31, 2016, the term of the member of the Coordinating Council who is a county superintendent of schools; providing that the terms of specified appointed and ex officio members of the Coordinating Council shall begin on January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of