MD SB316 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a workgroup to examine specified issues relating to health care facilities and abuser registries, including due process issues relating to a person's name being listed in the registry and the appropriate scope of the registry; and requiring the Department to submit a report to committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2012.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 347278/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Privacy
Records
Reports
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Privacy
Records
Reports
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment