MD SB314 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the composition of the Financial Education and Capability Commission to include one representative of a nonprofit organization in the State that provides financial assistance and free financial education to State residents for postsecondary education.
Title
State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - Composition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Debt Management
Education
Nonprofit Organizations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Debt Management
Education
Nonprofit Organizations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials