MD SB314 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a unit of the Executive Branch of State government to obtain mental health support services for specified individuals affected by a traumatic event that occurs in a State facility of a unit and results in the death of an individual; requiring specified mental health support services to be provided to an employee within 48 hours after the traumatic event occurs; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Traumatic Events - Mental Health Support Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 387476/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 387476/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Correctional Institutions
Death
Juvenile Facilities
Mental Health
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Employees
State Hospitals
Administrative Agencies
Correctional Institutions
Death
Juvenile Facilities
Mental Health
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Employees
State Hospitals