MD SB313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a calculation of damages for loss of earnings resulting from personal injury or wrongful death from being reduced based on race, ethnicity, or gender; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB244 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Damages
Data
Demographics
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Injury
Wrongful Death
Civil Actions and Procedures
Damages
Data
Demographics
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Injury
Wrongful Death
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 11 | 109.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |