MD SB313 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a holder of a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license in the 47th legislative district in Prince George's County that obtains a special entertainment permit to allow an individual at least a specified age to be present on the licensed premises under specified circumstances; and altering the age for admission to specified special entertainment events in the 47th legislative district under specified circumstances.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events in the 47th Legislative District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884536/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Prince George's County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Prince George's County