MD SB310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB199
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a certain provision of law requiring a campaign finance entity to terminate and file a final campaign finance report applies; altering the time period within which a certain campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a final campaign finance report; requiring the State Board of Elections to provide a certain notification to certain persons affiliated with a campaign finance entity that is required to terminate under a certain provision of law; etc.
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB199 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 13 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |