MD SB310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain person from selling an unpackaged cigarette; authorizing an enforcement officer of the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program in the Baltimore City Health Department to enforce the Act in a certain manner; requiring an enforcement officer to report a violation of the Act to a State's Attorney; and providing that issuance of a citation for violation of a certain provision of law precludes prosecution under the Act for a violation arising out of the same incident.
Title
Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (120-10) (Y: 120 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (120-10) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-28 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cigarettes
Citations
Comptroller
Health, Department of
Retail Sales
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cigarettes
Citations
Comptroller
Health, Department of
Retail Sales