MD SB310 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Program; providing for the purpose of the Program; providing that participation in the Program by a local school system is voluntary; providing that, beginning with the graduating class of 2016, specified eligible students shall receive the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy affixed to a diploma or transcript under specified circumstances; requiring the State Board of Education to establish specified criteria and requirements on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |