MD SB310 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Comptroller to issue a Class 7 micro-brewery license in Montgomery County to a holder of a Class D beer and light wine license.
Title
Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {664732/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Comptroller
Montgomery County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Comptroller
Montgomery County