MD SB310 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, notwithstanding a specified regulation, Garrett County to store coal combustion by-products used as a traction aide in winter driving conditions in the same locations and in the same manner that the coal combustion by-products were stored on January 1, 2013.
Title
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |