MD SB310 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-04 - Delegates Rice, Olszewski, and Kaiser
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-04 - Delegates Rice, Olszewski, and Kaiser
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date by which a county governing body must make a request to the State Board of Education for a waiver from the maintenance of effort requirement; requiring the State Board of Education to consider specified factors when making a decision whether to grant a waiver; altering the date by which the State Board of Education must inform the county governing body whether the waiver application has been granted or denied; etc.
Title
Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - Process and Factors
Sponsors
Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] |
Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-04 | Delegates Rice, Olszewski, and Kaiser | |
2010-04-04 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-04 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-2) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-10 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-10 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Senators Kasemeyer, Robey, and Brinkley | |
2010-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |