MD SB308 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse" in provisions of law relating to child abuse to include the sex trafficking of a child by any individual; defining the terms "sexual molestation or exploitation" and "sex trafficking" in provisions of law relating to child abuse; etc.
Title
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {512614/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment {673920/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |