MD SB308 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that, in a prosecution for the use or possession of marijuana, or the use or possession with intent to use drug paraphernalia related to marijuana, it is an affirmative defense that the defendant used or possessed marijuana or drug paraphernalia related to marijuana because the defendant has a debilitating condition, the condition is severe and resistant to conventional medicine, and marijuana is likely to provide the defendant with therapeutic or palliative relief from the condition; etc.
Title
Medical Marijuana - Affirmative Defenses - Maryland Medical Marijuana Model
Sponsors
Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Sophocleus) {703724/1 Rejected (Y: 49 N: 82 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Stifler) {353121/1 Rejected (Y: 43 N: 82 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - Floor Amendment (Haddaway) {463421/1 Rejected (Y: 42 N: 79 NV: 17 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Sophocleus) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 81 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Sophocleus) {703724/1 Rejected (Y: 49 N: 82 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Stifler) {353121/1 Rejected (Y: 43 N: 82 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - Floor Amendment (Haddaway) {463421/1 Rejected (Y: 42 N: 79 NV: 17 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Sophocleus) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 81 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (83-50) | |
2011-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Sophocleus) Rejected (49-82) | |
2011-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Stifler) Rejected (43-82) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Haddaway-Riccio) Rejected (42-79) | |
2011-04-05 | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Sophocleus) Rejected (41-81) | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Health and Government Operations & Judiciary | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (38-6) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (41-6) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Diseases
Drugs
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Identification
Licenses
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Privacy
Procurement
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Witnesses
Agriculture, Department of
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Diseases
Drugs
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Identification
Licenses
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Privacy
Procurement
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Witnesses