MD SB307 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $9,410,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {904164/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Banks and Trust Companies
Calvert County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Credit
Fiduciaries
Income Tax
Insurance
Interest
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
News Media
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Treasurers
Agents and Brokers
Banks and Trust Companies
Calvert County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Credit
Fiduciaries
Income Tax
Insurance
Interest
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
News Media
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Treasurers