MD SB306 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 3 to 5 the number of years within which an application for a transfer of a certain alcoholic beverages license in Baltimore County must occur; establishing additional circumstances under which the Board of License Commissioners may approve a change of location of a certain alcoholic beverages license; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time