MD SB306 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of a "motorized passenger scooter" on specified highways in the municipal boundaries of Ocean City under specified conditions; authorizing the State Highway Administration to prohibit the operation of a motorized passenger scooter on a bicycle way on specified highways under specified circumstances; defining terms; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motorized Passenger Scooter - Use in Ocean City
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-4) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Ocean City
Traffic Regulation
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Ocean City
Traffic Regulation