MD SB304 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Commission on Health in All Policies; providing for the purpose, composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; specifying the duties of the Commission; requiring specified health impact assessments to be performed in a specified manner; requiring the Commission to report to the Governor and General Assembly on December 1 of each year on the findings from and recommendations based on any health impact assessments performed by the Commission; etc.
Title
Maryland Commission on Health in All Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Education
Environmental Matters
Ethnic Affairs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Mass Transit
Public Health
Reports
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Education
Environmental Matters
Ethnic Affairs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Mass Transit
Public Health
Reports
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment