MD SB302 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a person who causes personal injury or wrongful death while operating or attempting to operate a motor vehicle, and who has a 0.15 or more alcohol concentration in the person's blood or breath or who refuses to submit to a chemical test for alcohol concentration, is liable for punitive damages under specified circumstances; limiting liability for punitive damages under the Act solely to the person operating or attempting to operate the motor vehicle; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2016-02-19SenateThird Reading Passed (43-1)
2016-02-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-02-17SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {163822/1 Withdrawn
2016-02-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {918076/1 Report Adopted
2016-02-16SenateLaid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
2016-02-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {918076/1
2016-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-09SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-22SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback