MD SB300 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the aerial application of chlorpyrifos on or after October 1, 2020; prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos in the State on or after December 31, 2020; establishing the Pesticide Transition Fund to support Maryland farmers in the transition away from the use of chlorpyrifos and to support the work of the Pesticide Transition Task Force, including research on integrated pest management and implementation of the State's plan to transition away from the use of chlorpyrifos; establishing the Pesticide Transition Task Force; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Bailey) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment 623226/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment 563827/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment 753825/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (94-37)
2020-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-04HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-03SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2020-02-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-28SenateMotion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-30)
2020-02-28SenateFloor Amendment {623226/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (18-27)
2020-02-28SenateFloor Amendment {563827/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (22-23)
2020-02-28SenateFloor Amendment {753825/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27)
2020-02-28SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2020-02-27SenateMotion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-02-26SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2020-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-27SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-27SenateHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {974234/1 Adopted
2020-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {974234/1

Same As/Similar To

HB229 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture5210.6(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture5210.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0300?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0300f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0300t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0300_97423401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0300_75382501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0300_56382701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0300_62322602.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0300_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0300_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0428.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0429.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0430.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0431.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0458.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1275.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback