MD SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain insurance carriers to notify the Maryland Insurance Commissioner in a certain manner of the occurrence of a breach of the security of a system if the carrier conducts a certain investigation and determines that the breach creates a likelihood that personal information has been or will be misused; providing that compliance with the Act does not relieve a carrier from a duty to comply with certain requirements of federal law or certain provisions of State law relating to the protection of personal information; etc.
Title
Insurance - Breach of Security of a Computer System - Notification Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {477373/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Cybersecurity
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology