MD SB30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Failed (41-89)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Failed (41-89)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that a health care provider who attests in a certificate of a qualified expert or who testifies in relation to a proceeding before an arbitration panel or a court concerning compliance with or departure from standards of care devote no more than 20% of the provider's professional activities to activities that directly involve testimony in personal injury claims.
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Failed (41-89) (Y: 42 N: 90 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (30-16) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted (24-21) (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (24-21) (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/28 (Delegate Lam) Rejected (56-83) (Y: 57 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-52) (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-16) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (30-16) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted (24-21) (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (24-21) (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/28 (Delegate Lam) Rejected (56-83) (Y: 57 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-52) (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-16) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Failed (41-89) |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Hill) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (24-21) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted (24-21) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion limit debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (30-16) |
2018-04-06 | House | Delegates Moon, Cluster, and Sanchez |
2018-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senators Zirkin, Smith, and Ramirez |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (84-52) |
2018-03-27 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Lam) Rejected (56-83) |
2018-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {992712/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-16) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |