MD SB30 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an educational institution from requiring, requesting, suggesting, or causing a student, an applicant, or a prospective student to grant access to, allow observation of, or disclose information that allows access to or observation of the individual's personal electronic account; prohibiting an educational institution from compelling, as a condition of acceptance or participation in specified activities, an individual to add individuals to a list of contacts or to change privacy settings; etc.
Title
Educational Institutions - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Damages
Disclosure
District Courts
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Privacy
Public Information
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Damages
Disclosure
District Courts
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Privacy
Public Information
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology