MD SB3 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2025 an appropriation of $12,000,000 to the 9-8-8 Trust Fund.
Title
9–8–8 Trust Fund – Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493321/1 Adopted |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB271 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Death
Estates and Trusts
Governor
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Budgets
Death
Estates and Trusts
Governor
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 5 | 5A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 5A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |