MD SB298 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the salary of the Sheriff of St. Mary's County, the County Treasurer of St. Mary's County, and the State's Attorney for St. Mary's County; and providing for the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-0) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428
2017-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (35-0)
2017-04-10SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {340414/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-24HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2017-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-21SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-20SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-02-09SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0298&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0298f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0298t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0298e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_428_sb0298e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0298_34041401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0298.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0298_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0298_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0298,s-0311&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0298,s-1490&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0298,h-1356&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback