MD SB296 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the statute of limitations for a violation of the prohibition on preventing or interfering with the making of a certain report of suspected sexual abuse of a child; providing that a person who violates the prohibition on preventing or interfering with the making of a certain report of suspected sexual abuse of a child may reserve a point or question for in banc review; etc.
Title
Family Law – Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child – Statute of Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {938371/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB296 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Family Law
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Family Law
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 705.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 705.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |