MD SB296 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an individual from committing a certain drunk or drugged driving offense if the individual has been convicted previously for certain other crimes under certain circumstances; making a violation of the Act a felony; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {962017/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {478273/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Jurisdiction
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Circuit Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Jurisdiction
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving