MD SB296 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each public school to make available free, unlimited, potable drinking water for each student throughout the school day and to include a reusable water bottle on the school supplies list; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {654437/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Beverage Containers
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Water
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Water