MD SB293 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration suspend the registration of specified vehicles owned by specified judgment debtors; authorizing the Administration to modify a driver's license suspension or issue a restrictive license for specified judgment debtors under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Judgment Debtors - License and Registration Suspension - Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Education
Health
Higher Education
Judgments
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Substance Abuse
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Health
Higher Education
Judgments
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Substance Abuse
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Work, Labor and Employment