MD SB292 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that administration of certain estates containing only certain motor vehicle or boat property is not required under certain circumstances; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to transfer title of certain motor vehicles under certain circumstances; and authorizing the agency that issued the certificate of title of a certain boat or vessel to transfer the title under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {936987/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2018-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {998679/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-08SenateHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0292&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0292f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0292t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0292e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_551_sb0292e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0292_99867901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0292_93698701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0292.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0292_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0326.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0292_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1299.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1383.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback