MD SB29 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the first Monday of October to be Young Heroes Day, in recognition of positive contributions that minors have made to society.
Title
State Government - Commemorative Day - Young Heroes Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-08-22 | Pre-filed |