MD SB288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the timing of the annual election of the officers of the Talbot County Board of Education; requiring the county board to elect a president and vice president from among its member at its last meeting at the end of each calendar year, or at the meeting in December each year.
Title
Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Carry Over) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 12A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 12A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |