MD SB288 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board of education to prohibit smoking a tobacco product at any time on the grounds of public school property; establishing penalties for violation of the Act; and defining "smoking".
Title
Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-8) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-8) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {933823/1 Adopted |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Forehand) {683326/1 Adopted |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307672/1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307672/1 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307672/1 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Cigarettes
Education, Boards of
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Smoking
Tobacco
Education, Boards of
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Smoking
Tobacco