MD SB287 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the educational requirements for an applicant to take the examination for a license to practice certified public accountancy to 120 semester hours or their equivalent and the possession of a baccalaureate or higher degree; and maintaining the education requirements for a license to practice at 150 semester hours or their equivalent and the possession of a baccalaureate or higher degree.
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Educational Requirements for Examination
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |