MD SB286 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Information Technology, or the Secretary's designee, on or before January 1, 2020, to adopt new nonvisual access procurement standards that provide individuals with disabilities with certain nonvisual access so the individuals have the same information, engage in the same interactions, and enjoy the same services as users without disabilities; requiring the Secretary or the Secretary's designee to establish a process for determining if certain information technology meets certain standards and for enforcing the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632
2018-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {616585/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {124637/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-01SenateHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0286&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0286f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0286t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0286e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_632_sb0286e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0286_12463701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0286_61658501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0286.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0286_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0193.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0286_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1074.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1141.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback