MD SB286 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from February 1 to July 1, of each year the date by which a revised State Comprehensive Juvenile Services 3-Year Plan is to be submitted to the General Assembly.
Title
Juvenile Services - State Comprehensive Juvenile Services 3-Year Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |